VA HB2168 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishment of the Commission on School Innovation, Modernization, and Competitiveness. Establishes the legislative Commission on School Innovation, Modernization, and Competitiveness (the Commission), consisting of 22 members, including 12 legislative members, eight nonlegislative citizen members, and two ex officio members, to develop and oversee the implementation of a goal and strategic plan for (i) promoting and increasing public high school student participation in dual enrollment courses, industry certifications, and state licensure examinations, (ii) modernizing public elementary and secondary school buildings throughout the Commonwealth, (iii) achieving the Commonwealth's teacher compensation goal, and (iv) ensuring high quality at the student and school division levels. The Commission sunsets on July 1, 2022.
Title
School Innovation, Modernization, and Competitiveness, Commission on; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N) (Y: 2 N: 95 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 30-N) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N) (Y: 2 N: 95 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 30-N) (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2019-02-24 | House | No further action taken |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: McDougle, Norment, Saslaw |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Yancey, Gilbert, Rush, Kory |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (2-Y 95-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (67-Y 30-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (67-Y 30-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19103878D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2168E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with amendments (8-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103878D |