VA HB216 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Nomination of candidates for elected offices; primary election or partisan nomination process required; restrictions on nomination method selected by political party; party identification on ballots. Requires each candidate who has been nominated by a political party or in a primary election to be identified by the name of his political party. The bill removes the restrictions on candidates for elected school boards and soil and water conservation districts from being nominated by a partisan nomination method or at a primary election. The bill further provides that a political party committee may not select a nomination method that will have the practical effect of excluding participation in the nominating process by qualified voters who are unable to attend meetings because they are (i) a member of a uniformed service, as defined in § 24.2-452, on active duty; (ii) temporarily residing outside of the United States; (iii) a student attending a school or institution of higher education; or (iv) a person with a disability.
Title
Nomination of candidates for elected offices; primary election or partisan nomination process.
Sponsors
Del. Dan Helmer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106100D-H1 |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2019-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101496D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 524 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 528 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 57.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 613 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 673 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |