VA HB2149 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Registration of aircraft. Updates terminology by changing "license" to "registration" to better reflect the responsibility of the Department of Aviation to locate and count aircraft. The bill removes from the Virginia Aviation Board the power and duty to promulgate rules for air traffic, construction and inspection of aircraft, qualifications and licensing of airmen, and stunt flying to better reflect the current regulatory responsibilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aircraft; aircraft to be registered with Department of Aviation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 793 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2149ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2149ER)
2017-02-23HouseEnrolled
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateReported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-01HouseRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-30HouseReported from Science and Technology (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Science and Technology
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102195D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
511(n/a)See Bill Text
511.6(n/a)See Bill Text
51113(n/a)See Bill Text
5114(n/a)See Bill Text
51150(n/a)See Bill Text
512.2(n/a)See Bill Text
515(n/a)See Bill Text
5188.1(n/a)See Bill Text
5188.2(n/a)See Bill Text
519.2(n/a)See Bill Text
519.5(n/a)See Bill Text
519.8(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2149
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2149+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2149ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2149ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0793+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H21V0004+HB2149
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1831+HB2149
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S11V0117+HB2149
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0670HB2149+HB2149
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0694HB2149+HB2149
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0695HB2149+HB2149
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0696HB2149+HB2149
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2890+HB2149
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1172HB2149+HB2149

Bill Comments

feedback