VA HB2147 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Service Members Civil Relief Act. Supplements the protections afforded under the federal Servicemembers Civil Relief Act by allowing service members to terminate or suspend a contract for the provision of telecommunication services, Internet services, television services, athletic club or gym memberships, or commercial mobile radio services at any time after the date the service member receives military orders to relocate for a period of service of at least 90 days to a location that does not support the contract. The bill sets out the method for termination and provides that a service member cannot be charged a penalty, fee, loss of deposit, or any other additional fee due to such termination or suspension. The bill also provides that a service member has the option to reinstate such services. The bill provides that violation of these provisions is a violation of the Virginia Consumer Protection Act (? 59.1-196 et seq.).
Title
Virginia Service Members Civil Relief Act; supplements protections afforded under federal Act.
Sponsors
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102735D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2147 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2147+hil |