VA HB2140 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Human Resource Management, alternative application for employment for persons with a disability. Directs the Department of Human Resource Management to create an alternative application process for the employment of persons with a disability. The process must be noncompetitive in nature and provide state agencies using the process an option for converting positions filled through the noncompetitive process into positions that are normally filled through a competitive process. The bill directs the Department of Human Resource Management to develop and disseminate a policy to implement the provisions of the bill. Department of Human Resource Management, alternative application for employment for persons with a disability. Directs the Department of Human Resource Management to create an alternative application process for the employment of persons with a disability. The process must be noncompetitive in nature and provide state agencies using the process an option for converting positions filled through the noncompetitive process into positions that are normally filled through a competitive process. The bill directs the Department of Human Resource Management to develop and disseminate a policy to implement the provisions of the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alternative application for employment for persons with a disability; DHRM to create a process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N) (Y: 79 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment(s) (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Passage (79-Y 20-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House (79-Y 20-N)
2021-01-28HousePrinted as engrossed 21102720D-E
2021-01-28HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2140E
2021-01-28HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-28HouseRead second time
2021-01-27HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseReported from General Laws with amendment(s) (18-Y 3-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102720D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221212(n/a)See Bill Text
222901.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2140
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2140+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2140E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB2140AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103777A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2140F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2140FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1101V0008+HB2140
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H11V0060+HB2140
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1263+HB2140
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0157+HB2140

Bill Comments

feedback