VA HB2132 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2132
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0460)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0460)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Homicides and assaults and bodily woundings; certain matters not to constitute defenses. Provides that another person's actual or perceived sex, gender, gender identity, or sexual orientation is not in and of itself, or together with an oral solicitation, a defense to any charge of capital murder, murder in the first degree, murder in the second degree, voluntary manslaughter, or assault and bodily wounding-related crimes and is not provocation negating or excluding malice as an element of murder. Homicides and assaults and bodily woundings; certain matters not to constitute defenses. Provides that another person's actual or perceived sex, gender, gender identity, or sexual orientation is not in and of itself, or together with an oral solicitation, a defense to any charge of capital murder, murder in the first degree, murder in the second degree, voluntary manslaughter, or assault and bodily wounding-related crimes and is not provocation negating or excluding malice as an element of murder.
Title
Homicides and assaults and bodily woundings; certain matters not to constitute defenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 39-N) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) (Y: 58 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0460) | |
2021-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 460 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2132ER) |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-25 | House | VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200404D-S1 (58-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 15-N) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2132S1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21200404D-S1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200404D-S1 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 42-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 42-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2132H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21104105D-H1 |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 21104105D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102483D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2132 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)