VA HB2123 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School boards; public institutions of higher education; College and Career Access Pathways Partnerships. Permits each local school board to enter into College and Career Access Pathways Partnerships (Partnerships), currently referred to as agreements, with comprehensive community colleges or other public institutions of higher education or educational institutions that offer a career and technical education curriculum. The bill requires any such Partnership to (i) specify the options for students to take courses as part of the career and technical education curriculum that lead to course credit or an industry-recognized credential, certification, or license concurrent with a high school diploma; (ii) specify the credit, credentials, certifications, or licenses available for such courses; and (iii) specify available options for students to participate in pre-apprenticeship and apprenticeship programs at comprehensive community colleges concurrent with the pursuit of a high school diploma and receive college credit and high school credit for successful completion of any such program. Current law allows local school boards to enter into agreements with such institutions but does not specify course credit as being part of the agreements. The bill provides that participation by a student in any course pursuant to the Partnerships does not deem such student eligible for a grant pursuant to the New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School boards; boards permitted to enter into College and Career Access Pathways Partnerships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0582)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 582 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-23SenateSigned by President
2019-02-23HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-23HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2123ER)
2019-02-23HouseEnrolled
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19103701D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2123E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-23HouseReported from Education with amendments (19-Y 2-N)
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103701D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2123
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2123+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2123E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2123ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0582+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0903V0017+HB2123
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0038+HB2123
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0203V0005+HB2123
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0024+HB2123
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2438+HB2123
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0251+HB2123
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0367+HB2123
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2123+HB2123
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0893HB2123+HB2123
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3213+HB2123

Bill Comments

feedback