VA HB2121 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement officers; grounds for decertification. Provides that no person who becomes a law-enforcement officer on or after July 1, 2013, may have been convicted of or pled guilty or no contest to any misdemeanor involving moral turpitude, including petit larceny, any misdemeanor sex offense, or any domestic assault. Additionally, any certified law-enforcement officer who has been convicted of or pled guilty or no contest to any such crime shall be decertified by the Criminal Justice Services Board. The bill additionally requires a sheriff, chief of police, or agency administrator to notify the Criminal Justice Services Board in writing when any certified law-enforcement officer or jail officer who is currently employed is convicted of or pleads guilty or no contest to certain crimes. Notice is also required when a law-enforcement officer or jail officer resigns or is terminated in advance of a pending drug screening or conviction of an offense that requires decertification. Upon receiving notice, the Criminal Justice Services Board shall decertify such officer. Finally, the bill allows for the Department of Criminal Justice Services to waive decertification requirements for good cause.
Title
Law-enforcement officers; grounds for decertification, DCJS authorized to waive requirements.
Sponsors
Del. Todd Gilbert [R] | Del. George Loupassi [R] | Del. Onzlee Ware [D] | Del. Charniele Herring [D] |
Del. David Ramadan [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0307) | |
2013-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 307 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2121ER) |
2013-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2121H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104539D-H1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2013-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104539D-H1 |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #2 |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102159D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1026 (Same As) 2013-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)