VA HB2119 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - House: Incorporated by General Laws (HB1584-Oder) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-01 - House: Incorporated by General Laws (HB1584-Oder) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Illegal gambling; definitions. Amends the definition of "illegal gambling" to clarify that the purchase of a product or other thing of value (e.g., phone card, Internet time), which purchase credits the purchaser with free points or other measurable units that may be risked by the purchaser for an opportunity to win money, is deemed consideration for the purposes of illegal gambling. The bill also clarifies that the conduct of a game, contest, lottery, scheme, or promotional offering may be lawful if (i) no part of the purpose of the contest is illegal gambling, (ii) no part of the contest involves the use of a gambling device, and (iii) the contest complies with certain requirements enumerated in the bill. The bill provides that it is declaratory of existing law.
Title
Illegal gambling; amends definitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | House: Incorporated by General Laws (HB1584-Oder) by voice vote | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1584-Oder) by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102628D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2119 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2119+hil |