VA HB2117 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility regulation. Reinstates much of the system under which investor-owned electric utilities were regulated prior to 1999. The measure repeals the Virginia Electric Utility Regulation Act and reenacts provisions relating to State Corporation Commission (SCC) ratemaking, including provisions addressing the recovery of fuel and purchased power costs, that existed prior to the 2007 legislation that re-regulated most of Virginia's investor-owned electric utilities. Existing provisions of the Virginia Electric Utility Regulation Act pertaining to ratemaking for electric cooperatives, to net energy metering, to consumer education programs, and to interconnections by farms are relocated to other chapters in Title 56. Rate adjustment clauses approved by the SCC will remain in effect as set forth in an enactment clause.
Title
Electric utilities; reinstates part of system under which investor-owned were regulated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned C & L sub: #3 Special Subcommittee on Energy | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100123D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1186.2:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1197.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1307.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2316.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3221.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3814 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 400.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:21 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2117 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2117+hil |