VA HB2113 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Science and Technology
Pending: House Science and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Science and Technology
Pending: House Science and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Limited liability companies; access to records. Authorizes limited liability companies to keep certain records either at the limited liability company's principal office or on a shared drive to which all members have access. Currently, the records are required to be kept at the limited liability company's principal office.
Title
Limited liability companies; access to records.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Science and Technology |
2015-02-02 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned S & T sub: Emerging Technologies Subcommittee |
2015-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2015-01-22 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-14 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100119D |