VA HB2112 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Real property taxation; land and improvement classifications. Allows the City of Charlottesville to levy a tax on improvements to real property at a different rate than the tax imposed upon the land on which the improvement is located, provided that the tax rate is not zero and does not exceed the tax rate imposed on the land. Currently, only the Cities of Fairfax, Poquoson, Richmond, and Roanoke are allowed to tax an improvement to real property independently from the land on which it is situated.
Title
Real property taxation; land and improvement classifications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in Finance |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100716D |