VA HB2110 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Delinquent tax lands. Extends the maximum duration of an installment agreement between a locality and a landowner to pay delinquent taxes from 60 to 72 months. Delinquent tax lands. Extends the maximum duration of an installment agreement between a locality and a landowner to pay delinquent taxes from 60 to 72 months.
Title
Delinquent tax lands; extends maximum duration of an installment agrmt. between locality/landlord.
Sponsors
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Michelle Maldonado [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0292) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 292 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2023 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2110ER) |
2023-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2110H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105187D-H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105187D-H1 |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (19-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102515D |