VA HB2110 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2110

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0111)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pretrial data collection. Requires the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission to collect and disseminate, on an annual basis, statewide and locality-level data related to adults charged with criminal offenses punishable by confinement in jail or a term of imprisonment. The bill provides that any personal or case identifying information within the data shall not be subject to the Virginia Freedom of Information Act and shall not be made publicly available. The bill does not require that the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission submit such annual report prior to December 1, 2022. Additionally, the bill requires the Virginia State Crime Commission to provide the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission with the final dataset of all adults charged with a criminal offense punishable by confinement in jail or a term of imprisonment in October 2017 and that the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission make such statewide and locality-level data publicly available on a website established and maintained by the Virginia Criminal Sentencing Commission as an electronic dataset, excluding any personal and case identifying information, by October 1, 2021, and on an electronic interactive data dashboard tool that displays aggregated data based on characteristics or indicators selected by the user by December 1, 2022. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pretrial data collection; VCSC to collect and disseminate on an annual basis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0111)
2021-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 111 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2110ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateRead third time
2021-02-17SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-10SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-10SenateReported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2110H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103550D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-22HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseIncorporates HB1945 (Jenkins)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
2021-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103550D-H1
2021-01-21HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102811D

Same As/Similar To

HB1945 (Similar To)
HB1945 (Similar To)
HB2110 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
SB1391 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0112)
SB1391 (Same As) 2021-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0112)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192134.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2110
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2110+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2110H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2110ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0111+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2110F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2110FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2110FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H08C0105+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0207C0007+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0075+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1361+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1423+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03C0133+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03V0004+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0039+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0114HB2110+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0136HB2110+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0137HB2110+HB2110
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0138HB2110+HB2110

Bill Comments 750

feedback