VA HB2109 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Guaranteed asset protection waivers. Establishes requirements for offering guaranteed asset protection (GAP) waivers, which are agreements, entered into as a part of or addendum to a motor vehicle financing agreement, under which the creditor agrees for a separate charge to waive or cancel amounts due on the finance agreement if the financed motor vehicle is totally damaged or stolen. The measure requires the creditor to insure its GAP waiver obligations; prohibits a creditor from conditioning an extension or term of credit on the purchase of a GAP waiver; requires a GAP waiver to include disclosures regarding the cancellation of the GAP waiver during a free look period; and establishes requirements and restrictions for the cancellation of GAP waivers, including refund provisions. The measure provides that GAP waivers are not insurance and are exempt from Virginia's insurance laws. This bill is identical to SB 1325.
Title
Guaranteed asset protection waivers; establishes requirements for offering waivers, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0799) | |
2019-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 799 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2109ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2109H1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104769D-H1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-15 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104769D-H1 |
2019-01-15 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103693D |