VA HB21 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on November 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Reproductive health services. Requires health benefit Reproductive health services. Requires health benefit plans to cover the costs of specified health care services, drugs, devices, products, and procedures related to reproductive health, including (i) well-woman preventive visits; (ii) counseling for sexually transmitted infections; (iii) screening for certain conditions; (iv) folic acid supplements; (v) breastfeeding support, counseling, and supplies; (vi) breast cancer chemoprevention counseling; (vii) contraceptive drugs, devices, or products; (viii) voluntary sterilization; and (ix) any additional preventive services for women that must be covered without cost sharing under federal law as of January 1, 2017. The mandated coverage does not include abortion services other than when performed when the life of the mother is endangered by a physical disorder, physical illness, or physical injury, including a life-endangering physical condition caused by or arising from the pregnancy itself, or when the pregnancy is the result of an alleged act of rape or incest. The measure provides an exemption for plans sold to religious employers. Carriers are prohibited from excluding a covered person from participating in, being denied the benefits of, or otherwise being subjected to discrimination in the coverage of or payment for reproductive health services, and a violation constitutes an unfair trade practice. The health benefit plan requirements become effective when a plan is delivered, issued for delivery, reissued, or extended in the Commonwealth on and after January 1, 2019, or at any time thereafter when any term of the health benefit plan is changed or any premium
Title
Reproductive health services; health benefit plans to cover costs of certain services.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-11-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-11-24 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100162D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 3407.5:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |