VA HB21 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax; exemption for certain nonprofit entities. Provides a sales and use tax exemption for entities exempt from federal income taxation under §501(c)(19)of the Internal Revenue Code, an exemption for veterans organizations that meet certain requirements.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for certain nonprofit veteran entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Left in Finance |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-11-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100463D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB21 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB21+hil |