VA HB21 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; polling place requirements. Permits a polling place for a county precinct to be located in a city wholly contained within the county on property owned by the county.
Title
Polling places; requirements for county precinct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0488) | |
2012-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 488 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB21ER) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-01-25 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House | |
2012-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-23 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-20 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee | |
2011-12-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2011-12-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100279D |