VA HB2099 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Shooting of muskrats and raccoons. Allows a landowner to trap or shoot fur-bearing animals including muskrats and raccoons upon his own land during the closed season when these animals are causing damage to his crops or property, or are posing a threat to human health or safety, or are causing a nuisance.
Title
Fur-bearing animals; landowner may trap, etc., upon his land during closed season if damaging.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 349 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2099ER) |
2013-02-18 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (87-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2099H1 |
2013-01-18 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 13104076D-H1 |
2013-01-18 | House | Read second time |
2013-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-16 | House | Committee substitute printed 13104076D-H1 |
2013-01-16 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103356D |