VA HB2093 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0208)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Fire Services Board; membership. Changes the membership of the Virginia Fire Services Board by removing a member of the Virginia Society of Fire Service Instructors and the State Fire Marshal and adding a certified Virginia fire service instructor and a local fire marshal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Fire Services Board; changes membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0208)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 208 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2093ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-07HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-07HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102201D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91202(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2093
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2093+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2093ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0208+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1101V0006+HB2093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0058+HB2093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1974+HB2093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2020+HB2093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0123+HB2093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2093+HB2093
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB2093+HB2093

Bill Comments

feedback