VA HB2085 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Division of Consumer Counsel of the Department of Law. Replaces references to the "Office of Consumer Affairs" with references to the "Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services" or the "Division of Consumer Counsel of the Department of Law." The changes reflect the transfer made in the 2012 Session of certain duties from the Office of Consumer Affairs in the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to the Division of Consumer Counsel in the Office of the Attorney General. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Consumer Counsel of Dept. of Law, Division of; replaces referenece to Office of Consumer Affairs.
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024) | |
2013-02-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 24 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2085ER) |
2013-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101268D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 963 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 298 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 326 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 328 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |