VA HB2081 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Polling places; prohibited activities; unlawful possession of a firearm; penalty. Prohibits any person from knowingly possessing a firearm within 40 feet of any building, or part thereof, used as a polling place, including one hour before and one hour after its use as a polling place, except for (i) a qualified law-enforcement officer or retired law-enforcement officer, (ii) any person occupying his own private property that falls within 40 feet of the polling place, or (iii) a licensed armed security officer whose employment or performance of his duties occurs within 40 feet of the polling place. The bill further provides that no person shall knowingly possess a firearm within 40 feet of a meeting place for the local electoral board while the electoral board meets to ascertain the results of an election or any place used as the setting for a recount. A violation of the provisions of the bill is a Class 1 misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Polling places; prohibited activities, unlawful possession of a firearm, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-25HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N)
2021-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House (53-Y 47-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-21HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102618D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242604(n/a)See Bill Text
242671(n/a)See Bill Text
242802.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback