VA HB2072 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Housing Development Authority; work group to establish Virginia Good Neighbor Next Door program. Requires the Virginia Housing Development Authority to report to the Governor, the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology, and the Virginia Housing Commission no later than July 1, 2022 on recommendations for the creation of a Virginia Good Neighbor Next Door program, similar to the Good Neighbor Next Door program administered by the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. to provide financial incentives for law-enforcement officers, firefighters, emergency medical services personnel, and teachers to purchase homes within designated revitalization areas in the localities in which they are employed. Virginia Housing Development Authority; work group to establish Virginia Good Neighbor Next Door program. Requires the Virginia Housing Development Authority to report to the Governor, the Chairmen of the House Committee on General Laws and the Senate Committee on General Laws and Technology, and the Virginia Housing Commission no later than July 1, 2022 on recommendations for the creation of a Virginia Good Neighbor Next Door program, similar to the Good Neighbor Next Door program administered by the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. to provide financial incentives for law-enforcement officers, firefighters, emergency medical services personnel, and teachers to purchase homes within designated revitalization areas in the localities in which they are employed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Good Neighbor Next Door program; VHDA shall report recommendations for creating Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2072H1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103402D-H1
2021-01-28HouseRead second time
2021-01-27HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103402D-H1
2021-01-26HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2021-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2021-01-12HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-12HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102307D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2072
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2072+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2072H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103402D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103402.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2072F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2072FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1102V0051+HB2072
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H11V0051+HB2072
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1249+HB2072
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0142+HB2072

Bill Comments

feedback