VA HB2065 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0021)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0021)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Telework expenses tax credit; expiration. Advances expiration of the telework expenses tax credit to January 1, 2019. Under current law, the tax credit will expire on January 1, 2022.
Title
Telework expenses; advances expiration of tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 26-N) (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 26-N) (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0021) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 21 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2065ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance (12-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-18 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 26-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Read third time and passed House (69-Y 26-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-14 | House | Reported from Finance (16-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101540D |