VA HB2053 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0830)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Direct primary care agreements. Provides that a direct agreement between a patient, the patient's legal representative, or the patient's employer and a health care provider for ongoing primary care services in exchange for the payment of a monthly periodic fee is not health insurance or a health maintenance organization, if patients are not required to pay monthly periodic fees prior to initiation of the direct agreement coverage period. The measure also provides that a health care provider who participates in a direct primary care practice may participate in a health insurance carrier network so long as the provider is willing and able to meet the terms and conditions of network membership set by the health insurance carrier. The measure establishes requirements for disclosures regarding direct primary care agreements, including a list of the services covered under the agreement. This bill is identical to SB 800.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct primary care agreements; the Commonwealth's insurance laws do not apply.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1, 2 and 3 (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 67-N) (Y: 31 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 22-N) (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N) (Y: 1 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 12-N) (Y: 83 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0830)
2017-04-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 830 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05HouseCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2053ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1, 2 and 3 (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (31-Y 67-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation to Amendment #4 (31-Y 67-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation to Amendments 1, 2 and 3 (97-Y 1-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2053ER)
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled
2017-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 22-N)
2017-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (73-Y 22-N)
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-02-24 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Stanley, Dunnavant, Barker
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: Landes, Kilgore, Bagby
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-22HouseHouse acceded to request
2017-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2017-02-21SenateSenate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-02-20HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 94-N)
2017-02-20HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 17105281D-S1 (1-Y 94-N)
2017-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-16SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
2017-02-16SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2053S1
2017-02-16SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17105281D-S1
2017-02-16SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-16SenateRead third time
2017-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105281D-S1
2017-02-13SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-02HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (83-Y 12-N)
2017-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House (83-Y 12-N)
2017-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB2053H2
2017-02-01HouseSubstitute by Delegate Landes agreed to 17105005D-H2
2017-02-01HouseCommittee substitute rejected 17104598D-H1
2017-02-01HouseRead second time
2017-01-31HousePassed by for the day
2017-01-31HouseFloor substitute printed 17105005D-H2 (Landes)
2017-01-30HouseRead first time
2017-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104598D-H1
2017-01-26HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102438D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412997(n/a)See Bill Text
5412999.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2053
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2053+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2053H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2053H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2053S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2053ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2053ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0830+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H14V0054+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1847+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S02V0120+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0554HB2053+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0604HB2053+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2497+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0752HB2053+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1025HB2053+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2784+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2886+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2887+HB2053
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1169HB2053+HB2053

Bill Comments

feedback