VA HB2049 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2049
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; customer credit reinvestment offsets. Eliminates customer credit reinvestment offsets under which a utility is allowed, upon request, to reduce or eliminate amounts of overearnings that otherwise would be required to be credited to customers by applying a customer credit reinvestment offset for expenses on new solar and wind generation facilities and electric distribution grid transformation projects.
Title
Electric utilities; eliminates customer credit reinvestment offsets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) (Y: 56 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (56-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (12-Y 10-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102818D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2049 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)