VA HB203 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Extended foster care services and support. Creates the Extended Foster Care Services and Support Program to provide foster care services and support, including foster care maintenance payments, to qualifying individuals age 18 to 21 who were formerly in the custody of a local board of social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extended Foster Care Services and Support Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-18HouseLeft in Appropriations
2016-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2016-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2016-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 16104060D-H1
2016-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2016-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2016-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
2016-01-20HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2015-12-28HouseIntroduced bill reprinted 16101374D
2015-12-28HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2015-12-28HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101374D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
161241(n/a)See Bill Text
161283.3(n/a)See Bill Text
632100(n/a)See Bill Text
632916(n/a)See Bill Text
632921(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback