VA HB2022 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; rent increase during tenancy; conditions. Provides that a rental agreement shall not contain provisions that the tenant agrees to pay any increase in rent during the term of a written lease unless such increase is agreed to in a separate, written document signed by the tenant and the landlord that includes (i) the new amount of rent to be charged to the tenant, (ii) the date upon which the rent increase becomes effective, and (iii) any additional terms or benefits to the tenant agreed to as consideration for such increase in rent.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; rent increase during tenancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Left in General Laws |
2023-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103906D |