VA HB2021 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB2527-Howell, W.J.) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB2527-Howell, W.J.) by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allocation of revenue-sharing funds. Removes the priority structure for allocation of revenue-sharing funds to localities and provides for funding of no less than $50 million each fiscal year. This bill incorporates
Title
Allocation of revenue-sharing funds; removes priority structure to localities.
Sponsors
Del. Joe May [R] | Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-31 | House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB2527-Howell, W.J.) by voice vote | |
2011-01-31 | House: Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2527-Howell, W.J.) by voice vote | |
2011-01-27 | House: Assigned App. sub: Transportation | |
2011-01-25 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-25 | House: Incorporates HB2203 | |
2011-01-25 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104500D-H1 | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101890D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2203 (Similar To) 2011-01-25 - House: Incorporated by Transportation (HB2021-May) by voice vote