VA HB2019 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Town and county treasurer reciprocal agreements. Allows the treasurer of any county and the treasurer of any town partially or totally within that county to enter into a reciprocal agreement granting each treasurer the authority to collect the other's local real and personal property taxes. The governing body of each locality must approve the agreement. Identical to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Town and county treasurers; reciprocal agreements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475)
2011-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 475 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-02-25 Senate: Signed by President
2011-02-25 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-02-25 House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2019ER)
2011-02-25 House: Enrolled
2011-02-18 Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-18 Senate: Read third time
2011-02-17 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2011-02-16 Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
2011-02-09 Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance
2011-02-09 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed
2011-02-08 House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2011-02-08 House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 House: Printed as engrossed 11101919D-E
2011-02-07 House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2019E
2011-02-07 House: Amendment by Delegate May agreed to
2011-02-07 House: Committee amendments agreed to
2011-02-07 House: Read second time
2011-02-04 House: Read first time
2011-02-02 House: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2011-01-31 House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
2011-01-17 House: Assigned Finance sub: #2
2011-01-11 House: Referred to Committee on Finance
2011-01-11 House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101919D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813910(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB2019
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2019+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2019E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB2019ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0475+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H1002V0051+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H10V0064+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV0578+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S05V0253+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0498HB2019+HB2019
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0525HB2019+HB2019

Bill Comments 750

feedback