VA HB2017 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Public Procurement Act; bid, performance, and payment bonds; waiver by localities. Authorizes a locality, where the bid, performance, and payment bond requirements are waived, to waive the requirement for prequalification for a bidder or contractor with a current Class A contractor license for nontransportation-related construction contracts in excess of $100,000 but less than $300,000 upon a written determination made in advance by the local governing body that waiving the requirement is in the best interests of the locality. The bill prohibits localities from entering into more than 10 such contracts per year in which the bidder or contractor's prequalification requirement has been waived. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Public Procurement Act; bid, performance, and payment bonds, waiver by localities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0789)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 789 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2017ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 1-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's substitute printed 17105932D-H2
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2017ER)
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled
2017-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 3-N)
2017-02-23HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 3-N)
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-22SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-22SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-02-22SenateReading of amendments waived
2017-02-22SenateRead third time
2017-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2017-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2017-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N)
2017-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N)
2017-01-27HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2017H1
2017-01-27HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104566D-H1
2017-01-27HouseRead second time
2017-01-26HouseRead first time
2017-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104566D-H1
2017-01-24HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (20-Y 2-N)
2017-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 0-N)
2017-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102092D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
224336(n/a)See Bill Text
224337(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2017
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2017+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2017H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2017ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2017H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2017ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0789+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1102V0013+HB2017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H11V0042+HB2017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1719+HB2017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S12V0183+HB2017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0802HB2017+HB2017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0852HB2017+HB2017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2736+HB2017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2884+HB2017
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1167HB2017+HB2017

Bill Comments

feedback