VA HB2016 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Forestry; conveyance of easement; New Kent County. Authorizes the conveyance of a right-of-way easement from the Department of Forestry to John D. Tolley and Laurie L. Tolley. The easement, which will follow an existing road across a portion of the New Kent Forestry Center, will allow ingress and egress from State Route 60 to the Tolleys' property.
Title
New Kent County; Department of Forestry's conveyance of easement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0186) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 186 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2016ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2016H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105027D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105027D-H1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102042D |