VA HB2016 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric personal delivery devices. Allows for the operation of electric personal delivery devices on the sidewalks and shared-use paths and across roadways on crosswalks in the Commonwealth unless otherwise prohibited by a locality. The bill directs that such devices shall not be considered vehicles and are exempt from the motor carrier provisions of Title 46.2 (Motor Vehicles). This bill is identical to SB 1207.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric personal delivery devices; operation on sidewalks and shared-use paths.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendments (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0788)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 788 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2016ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-16HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2016ER)
2017-02-24HouseEnrolled
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 1-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-20SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-02-20SenateReading of amendments waived
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateReported from Transportation with amendments (9-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2016H1
2017-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104708D-H1
2017-02-06HouseRead second time
2017-02-03HouseRead first time
2017-02-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104708D-H1
2017-02-02HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101983D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462100(n/a)See Bill Text
4621015(n/a)See Bill Text
4622101(n/a)See Bill Text
462904(n/a)See Bill Text
462908(n/a)See Bill Text
462908.1(n/a)See Bill Text
462908.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2016
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2016+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2016H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2016ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2016ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0788+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1904V0011+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H19V0064+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2107+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S11V0103+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S11V0130+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0670HB2016+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0694HB2016+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0695HB2016+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0696HB2016+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2604+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2883+HB2016
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1166HB2016+HB2016

Bill Comments

feedback