VA HB2014 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Education; biennial review of the standards of quality; odd-numbered years. Changes from even-numbered years to odd-numbered years the biennial review of the standards of quality that is required of the Board of Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards of quality; biennial review by Board of Education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
2017-04-05HouseEnacted, Chapter 787 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2014ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-25HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-25HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-25HousePassed by temporarily
2017-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-17 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017
2017-02-17HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17
2017-02-17SenateSigned by President
2017-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2014ER)
2017-02-15HouseEnrolled
2017-02-13SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenateRead third time
2017-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-09SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2017-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2017-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-26HouseRead first time
2017-01-25HouseReported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2017-01-20HouseAssigned Education sub: Education Innovation
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103942D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22118.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2014
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2014+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2014ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2014ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0787+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0903V0005+HB2014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H09V0064+HB2014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1699+HB2014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S04V0210+HB2014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0464HB2014+HB2014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0471HB2014+HB2014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2820+HB2014
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1142HB2014+HB2014

Bill Comments

feedback