VA HB201 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1153)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Elections; voter registration; extended time for persons to register in person. Provides any person who is qualified to vote is entitled to register to vote in person up to and including the day of the election at the office of the general registrar in the locality in which the person resides or at the polling place for the precinct in which the person resides. Under current law, registration records close for registration purposes, whether in person or by other means, 21 days prior to a primary or general election. The bill has a delayed effective date of October 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; same-day registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N) (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1153)
2020-04-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1153 (effective 10/1/22)
2020-03-20 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-20HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020
2020-03-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-18SenateSigned by President
2020-03-18HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB201ER)
2020-03-18HouseEnrolled
2020-03-07SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2020-03-05HouseVOTE: Adoption (52-Y 44-N)
2020-03-05HouseConference report agreed to by House (52-Y 44-N)
2020-03-05 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-03-05SenateSenators: Deeds, Boysko, Peake
2020-03-05SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-03-04HouseDelegates: Ayala, Simon, Runion
2020-03-04HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-03-04HouseHouse acceded to request
2020-03-03SenateSenate requested conference committee
2020-03-03SenateSenate insisted on amendment (27-Y 13-N)
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 100-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate with amendment (22-Y 18-N)
2020-02-27SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N)
2020-02-27SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2020-02-27SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-27SenateReading of amendment waived
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (13-Y 3-N)
2020-02-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 4-N)
2020-02-11SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-10HouseVOTE: Passage (53-Y 44-N)
2020-02-10HouseRead third time and passed House (53-Y 44-N)
2020-02-07HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB201H1
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106843D-H1
2020-02-07HouseRead second time
2020-02-06HouseRead first time
2020-02-05HouseReported from Appropriations (12-Y 9-N)
2020-02-04HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N)
2020-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-31HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-01-31HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2020-01-31HouseIncorporates HB187 (Simon)
2020-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106843D-H1
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2019-12-27HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-12-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103011D

Same As/Similar To

HB187 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242420.2(n/a)See Bill Text
242700(n/a)See Bill Text
242701(n/a)See Bill Text
242701.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB201&201+sum+HB201
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB201+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB201H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB201ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP1153+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1801V0015+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H18V0067+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0202V0040+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0106+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0159+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0734+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S08V0116+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0429+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0201+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1178HB0201+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1179HB0201+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1180HB0201+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1691+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1399HB0201+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1918+HB0201
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1692HB0201+HB0201

Bill Comments

feedback