VA HB2003 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comparative report of local government revenues and expenditures. Provides that the submittal of the comparative report by a locality to the Auditor of Public Accounts shall include a notarized statement from the chief elected official and the chief administrative officer of the locality that the locality's audited financial report has been presented to the local governing body.
Title
Local government revenues and expenditures; reports to Auditor of Public Accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0484) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 484 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2003ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102632D |
Subjects
Administration of Government
Auditor of Public Accounts
Counties Cities and Towns
Local Government and Officials
Auditor of Public Accounts
Counties Cities and Towns
Local Government and Officials