VA HB2 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Teacher licensure; reciprocity; spouses of Armed Forces members. Requires the Board of Education to provide for teacher licensure by reciprocity for any spouse of an active duty member of the Armed Forces of the United States or the Commonwealth who has obtained a valid out-of-state license, with full credentials and without deficiencies, that is in force at the time the application for a Virginia license is received by the Department of Education. The bill provides that no service requirements or licensing assessments shall be required for any such individual. This bill is identical to SB 103.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher licensure; reciprocity, spouses of Armed Forces members.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0745)
2018-04-04 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 745 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-07 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-07HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018
2018-03-05SenateSigned by President
2018-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-02HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2ER)
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled
2018-02-28HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 18107484D-S1 (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-26SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-26SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2S1
2018-02-26SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107484D-S1
2018-02-26SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-02-26SenateRead third time
2018-02-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2018-02-22SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107484D-S1
2018-02-22SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
2018-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE 2 (99-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2018-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-01-26HouseRead first time
2018-01-24HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-11-20HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100912D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221298.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB2
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB2S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB2ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0745+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0901V0015+HB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0006+HB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0117+HB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0127+HB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0256+HB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0676HB0002+HB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0689HB0002+HB0002
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1191+HB0002

Bill Comments

feedback