VA HB2 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Passed by for the day - Governor's veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Passed by for the day - Governor's veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clean Power Plan; state implementation plan; General Assembly approval. Requires the Department of Environmental Quality to receive approval from the General Assembly for a state implementation plan to regulate carbon dioxide emissions from existing power plants prior to submitting the plan to the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency for approval.
Title
Clean Power Plan; state implementation plan, General Assembly approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N 1-A) (Y: 66 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N 1-A) (Y: 66 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Passed by for the day - Governor's veto sustained |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance (10-Y 5-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (8-Y 7-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-01-27 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 34-N 1-A) |
2016-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 34-N 1-A) |
2016-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House |
2016-01-26 | House | Pending question ordered |
2016-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2016-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-19 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 6-N) |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-11-16 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100592D |
Same As/Similar To
SB21 (Same As) 2016-03-03 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto