VA HB2 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allocations within highway construction districts. Provides for the development of a prioritization process for projects funded by the Commonwealth Transportation Board. Such prioritization shall weight factors such as congestion mitigation, economic development, accessibility, safety, and environmental quality and be applied within each highway construction district.
Title
Commonwealth Transportation Board; statewide prioritization process for project selection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726) | |
2014-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 726 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-03-04 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 14105239D-S1 (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2S1 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14105239D-S1 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14105239D-S1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2H1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14104588D-H1 |
2014-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104588D-H1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-11-18 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100798D |