VA HB1996 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Summons for Unlawful Detainer form; plain English instructions. Requires the Forms and Efiling Subcommittee of the Supreme Court of Virginia's Access to Justice Commission to develop plain English instructions, as defined in the bill, that explain to defendants how to interpret Form DC-421 (Summons for Unlawful Detainer/Civil Claim for Eviction). The bill further requires that such instructions (i) be printed in no less than 14 point type; (ii) be understandable to persons whose literacy level matches the Virginia literacy level for fourth grade; (iii) explain that failure to appear in court on the hearing date may result in eviction from the defendant's household; and (iv) provide the statewide Legal Aid and Virginia Eviction Reduction Pilot program websites and, if applicable, telephone numbers, directing defendants to contact those programs for more information and assistance. Summons for Unlawful Detainer form; plain English instructions. Requires the Forms and Efiling Subcommittee of the Supreme Court of Virginia's Access to Justice Commission to develop plain English instructions, as defined in the bill, that explain to defendants how to interpret Form DC-421 (Summons for Unlawful Detainer/Civil Claim for Eviction). The bill further requires that such instructions (i) be printed in no less than 14 point type; (ii) be understandable to persons whose literacy level matches the Virginia literacy level for fourth grade; (iii) explain that failure to appear in court on the hearing date may result in eviction from the defendant's household; and (iv) provide the statewide Legal Aid and Virginia Eviction Reduction Pilot program websites and, if applicable, telephone numbers, directing defendants to contact those programs for more information and assistance.
Title
Summons for Unlawful Detainer form; plain English instructions for interpretation of form.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 447 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1996ER) |
2023-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1996H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23105393D-H1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2023-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 23105393D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 4-N) |
2023-01-13 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102270D |