VA HB1989 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (27-Y 69-N 2-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-31 - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (27-Y 69-N 2-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Leaves of absence; General Assembly members. Provides that all officers and employees of the Commonwealth, or of any political subdivision of the Commonwealth, who are members of the General Assembly shall be entitled to unpaid leaves of absence from their respective duties without loss of seniority, accrued leave or job performance rating on all days during which the General Assembly is in Session or during which a member is conducting official duties related to service in the General Assembly. A member of the General Assembly shall not be denied reemployment, retention in employment, promotion, or any benefit of employment by such employer solely on the basis of service in the General Assembly.
Title
General Assembly members; leaves of absence from employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (27-Y 69-N 2-A) (Y: 28 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendment (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-31 | House: VOTE: ENGROSSMENT REFUSED (27-Y 69-N 2-A) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Engrossment refused by House (27-Y 69-N 2-A) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-28 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | House: Reported from Rules with amendment (11-Y 4-N) | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100134D |