VA HB1987 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-11)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Telemedicine. Requires the Board of Medical Assistance Services to amend the state plan for medical assistance to provide for payment of medical assistance for remote patient monitoring services provided via telemedicine for certain high-risk patients, makes clear that nothing shall preclude health insurance carriers from providing coverage for services delivered through real-time audio-only telephone that are not telemedicine, and clarifies rules around prescribing of Schedule II through VI drugs via telemedicine, including establishing a practitioner-patient relationship via telemedicine. Telemedicine. Requires the Board of Medical Assistance Services to amend the state plan for medical assistance to provide for payment of medical assistance for remote patient monitoring services provided via telemedicine for certain high-risk patients, makes clear that nothing shall preclude health insurance carriers from providing coverage for services delivered through real-time audio-only telephone that are not telemedicine, and clarifies rules around prescribing of Schedule II through VI drugs via telemedicine, including establishing a practitioner-patient relationship via telemedicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telemedicine; coverage of telehealth services by an insurer, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HousePrinted as engrossed 21103569D-EH1
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB1987EH1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103569D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103569D-H1
2021-01-26HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102502D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321325(n/a)See Bill Text
3823418.16(n/a)See Bill Text
5413303(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1987
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1987+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1987H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1987EH1+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1987AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103482D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1987F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1987FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1987FEH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1201V0007+HB1987
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0063+HB1987
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0205V0014+HB1987
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0085+HB1987
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1352+HB1987
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1414+HB1987
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S04V0101+HB1987

Bill Comments

feedback