VA HB1983 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School calendar; opening day of the school year. Makes local school boards responsible for setting the school calendar and determining the opening day of the school year and eliminates the post-Labor Day opening requirement and "good cause" scenarios for which the Board of Education may grant waivers of this requirement. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
School calendar; opening day of school year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-26 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 24-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (75-Y 24-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported from Education (15-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101307D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 26 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 79.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |