VA HB1977 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter identification; accepted forms of identification. Adds to the list of acceptable forms of voter identification a valid student photo identification card issued by any institution of higher education located in any other state or territory of the United States. Current law allows students from any institution of higher education located in the Commonwealth to use their student photo identification cards for purposes of voting.
Title
Voter identification; accepted forms of identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100529D |