VA HB1965 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fort Monroe Authority; payments to the City of Hampton in lieu of real property taxes. Provides that, for real estate leased by the Fort Monroe Authority (the Authority) to a private owner, such real estate shall be taxed by the City of Hampton as if it were privately owned and billed directly to the lessee. However, if the lease term is less than 20 years, Hampton shall bill the Authority. The bill provides that the Authority and its lessees may use existing procedures for contesting assessments and taxes. Current law provides that land owned by the Authority is subject to a fee in lieu of real property taxes, but is silent on the treatment of land leased by the Authority to a private party. The bill contains technical amendments. This bill is identical to SB 1089.
Title
Fort Monroe Authority; payments to the City of Hampton in lieu of real property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0468) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 468 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1965ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1965H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105066D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105066D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102030D |