VA HB1965 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local capital improvement programs. Adds "life cycle costs" to the facilities estimates prepared as part of the capital improvement program.
Title
Local capital improvement programs; adds life cycle costs to facilities estimates.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0658) | |
2011-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 658 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-25 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1965ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-24 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-21 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100742D |