VA HB1960 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tow truck drivers and towing and recovery operators; requirements; penalties. Creates a civil penalty of $150 to be paid into the Literary Fund for any tow truck driver or towing and recovery operator convicted of improperly towing in Planning District 8 (Northern Virginia). The bill exempts tow truck drivers and towing and recovery operators in Planning District 8 from any requirement by a towing advisory board for written authorization in addition to a written contract in the event that a vehicle is being removed from private property. The bill requires that a tow truck driver in Planning District 8 immediately notify the animal control office in the locality from which the vehicle is being towed if the vehicle is occupied by a companion animal. The bill limits the membership of a local towing advisory board to only representatives of local law-enforcement agencies, representatives of licensed towing and recovery operators, and one member of the general public and requires the chairmanship of any towing advisory board within Planning District 8 to rotate annually between board members who represent a licensed towing and recovery operator, a local law-enforcement agency, and the general public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tow truck drivers and towing and recovery operators; civil penalty for improper towing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (33-Y 67-N) (Y: 33 N: 67 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 31-N) (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with amendment (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 28-N) (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0825)
2017-04-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 825 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05HouseCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1960ER2)
2017-04-05HouseReenrolled
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part
2017-04-05SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (39-Y 1-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: REJECTED (33-Y 67-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation to Amendment #1 (33-Y 67-N)
2017-04-05HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation to Amendment #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17
2017-02-24SenateSigned by President
2017-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1960ER)
2017-02-24HouseEnrolled
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 31-N)
2017-02-21HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (66-Y 31-N)
2017-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (31-Y 9-N)
2017-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2017-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2017-02-20SenateRead third time
2017-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-15SenateReported from Transportation with amendment (10-Y 3-N)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 28-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (68-Y 28-N)
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1960H1
2017-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 17104664D-H1
2017-02-06HouseRead second time
2017-02-03HouseRead first time
2017-02-02HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104664D-H1
2017-02-02HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2017-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2017-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2017-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101900D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
462119(n/a)See Bill Text
4621232(n/a)See Bill Text
4621233(n/a)See Bill Text
4621233.2(n/a)See Bill Text
591200(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1960
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1960+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1960H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1960ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1960ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0825+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1902V0018+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H19V0054+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2097+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S11V0107+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0670HB1960+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0720HB1960+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2599+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2881+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2882+HB1960
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1165HB1960+HB1960

Bill Comments

feedback