VA HB1958 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0882)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0882)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; market reforms. Conforms inconsistent and conflicting requirements of Virginia's health insurance laws to corresponding provisions of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act that became effective on September 23, 2010. The provisions of the federal act that are implemented by these amendments include (i) requirements that employers offering dependent coverage provide coverage for dependents of employees until they reach age 26; (ii) limits on the ability of insurers to impose annual and lifetime dollar limits on essential benefits; (iii) limits on rescission of health insurance policies except in cases of fraud or misrepresentation; (iv) requirements that nongrandfathered plans cover preventive services without out-of-pocket cost-sharing for the insured; (v) requirements that nongrandfathered plans permit covered persons to designate any participating primary health care professional who is available to accept the covered person and prohibits such plans from requiring authorization or referral for obstetrical or gynecological care by in-network health care professionals specializing in obstetrics or gynecology; (vi) prohibitions on nongrandfathered plans imposing preexisting condition exclusions for enrollees who are under 19 years of age; and (vii) prohibitions on nongrandfathered plans charging higher cost-sharing for emergency services that are obtained out of a plan's network or from requiring preauthorization for emergency services. The measure expires July 1, 2014.
Title
Health insurance; federal market reforms.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0882) | |
2011-04-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 882 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Communicated to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1958ER) | |
2011-02-25 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-21 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 5-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Senate amendments agreed to by House (93-Y 5-N) | |
2011-02-18 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-07 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N) | |
2011-02-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-04 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1958H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104566D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104566D-H1 | |
2011-02-01 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103752D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 137.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.15:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3406.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3406.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3411.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3432.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3438 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3446 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3525 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4216.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4312.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 508.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |