VA HB1957 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Adult adoption; investigation and report. Removes the requirement that an investigation and report be conducted when a petition is filed for the adoption of a person 18 years of age or older on the basis of good cause shown and after a showing that the person to be adopted is at least 15 years younger than the petitioner and the petitioner and the person to be adopted have known each other for at least one year prior to the filing of the petition for adoption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult adoption; investigation and report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2021-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100326D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321244(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback