VA HB1954 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Obscenity. Modifies the educational, artistic, and theatrical exemption to obscenity laws by providing that certain crimes (child pornography and use of communications systems to facilitate certain offenses involving children) are not subject to the exemption.
Title
Obscenity; modifies educational, artistic, and theatrical exemption to laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (11-Y 4-N) | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101080D |